Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Possamai, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1929Born
8 Dec 195728.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Mar 198353.9AppointedBishop of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil
15 May 198354.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil
11 Apr 200778.0RetiredBishop of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil
27 Oct 201889.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ji-Paraná, Rondonia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Possamai
Bishop Antônio Possamai S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ji-Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscurra
Death PlacePorto Velho, Archdiocese of Porto Velho, Rondonia

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2007
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: CB, 27 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast