Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Afonso Ribeiro, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1929Born
7 Dec 195829.1Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
29 Jan 197949.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
29 Jan 197949.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bagis
5 May 197949.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bagis
6 Jul 198858.6AppointedPrelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil
3 May 200676.5RetiredPrelate of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil
10 Nov 200980.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Borba, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Afonso Ribeiro
Bishop José Afonso Ribeiro T.O.R. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Borba

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoconé

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 May 2006
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jun 2017