Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio de Freitas Silveira, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Joinville, Santa Catarina

Titular Bishop of Voncaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1885BornCampo Bello do Prato
13 Jun 190823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
25 Jan 192943.7AppointedBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil
9 Jun 192944.1Ordained BishopBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil
19 Jan 195569.7ResignedBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil
19 Jan 195569.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Voncaria
19 May 196378.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pio de Freitas Silveira:
Bishop Pio de Freitas Silveira C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Joinville

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013