Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emmanuel Kataliko

Deceased

Archbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1932Born
20 Dec 195826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Butembo-Beni, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
17 May 196634.3AppointedBishop of Butembo-Beni, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Oct 196634.7Ordained BishopBishop of Butembo-Beni, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Mar 199765.1AppointedArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
4 Oct 200068.7DiedArchbishop of Bukavu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Kataliko
Archbishop Emmanuel Kataliko (born 1932, died ) Archbishop of Bukavu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLukale

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast