Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Johannes

Deceased

Bishop of Leavenworth, Kansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1874BornMittelstreu, Germany
3 Jan 189722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
19 Dec 192753.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
19 Dec 192753.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thasus
1 May 192854.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thasus
20 Apr 192955.2SucceededBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
13 Mar 193763.1DiedBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Johannes:
Bishop Francis Johannes (born , died ) Bishop of Leavenworth

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013