Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franco Moscone, C.R.S.

Archbishop-Elect of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1957 Born
22 Sep 197719.7Temporary VowsMember of Clerks Regular of Somasca
26 Sep 198224.7Perpetual VowsMember of Clerks Regular of Somasca
6 Nov 198325.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Clerks Regular of Somasca
16 Jun 198426.5Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
28 Feb 200850.2AppointedSuperior General of Clerks Regular of Somasca
3 Nov 201860.8AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy
12 Jan 201961.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy
26 Jan 201961.1InstalledArchbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franco Moscone
Father Franco Moscone C.R.S. (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlba, Diocese of Alba (Pompea)
Ordained DeaconSan Mauro Torinese, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained PriestSerralunga d’Alba, Diocese of Alba (Pompea)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Alba, Diocese of Alba (Pompea)

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Manfredonia-Vieste-San Giovanni Rotondo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2018
  • b/c01: CB, 3 Nov 2018
  • ob: CB, 8 Nov 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 13 Nov 2018
  • c2: AM, 2 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Dec 2018

Quantcast