Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincent Dollmann

Archbishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1964 Born
24 Jun 199025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
17 May 201247.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
17 May 201247.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cursola
2 Sep 201248.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cursola
25 May 201853.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cambrai, France
15 Aug 201853.9SucceededArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Vincent Dollmann
Archbishop Vincent Dollmann (born ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMulhouse
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Strasbourg, Archdiocese of Strasbourg

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cambrai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 25 Jul 2012
  • c34: CB, 9 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,532
  • ab: CB, 8 Oct 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 May 2018
  • s: CB, 16 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Aug 2018

Quantcast