Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josu Iriondo Zabaleta

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Alton


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1938 Born
23 Dec 196224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
4 Dec 199657.9IncardinatedPriest of New York, New York, USA
30 Oct 200162.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
30 Oct 200162.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Alton
12 Dec 200162.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alton
1 Feb 201475.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Josu Iriondo Zabaleta
Bishop Josu Iriondo Zabaleta (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLegazti, Spain
Ordained PriestSan Sebastián, Diocese of San Sebastián, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of New York.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,084
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2014
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2001
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ln/c1: CB, 25 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Apr 2017