Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Chadwick

Deceased

Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1813Born
28 May 183623.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
17 Dec 183623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
31 Aug 186653.3AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 186653.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
8 Nov 186653.5InstalledBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
14 May 188269.0DiedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Chadwick (VIAF: 88450323)
Bishop James Chadwick (born , died ) Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrogheda, County Louth, Archdiocese of Armagh, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt Cuthbert College, Ushaw

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 297
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 63
  • od/c01: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017