Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Hogarth

Deceased

Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1786Born
14 Dec 180822.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 180923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
28 Jul 184862.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
28 Jul 184862.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Samosata
24 Aug 184862.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samosata
29 Sep 185064.5AppointedBishop of Hexham, England, Great Britain
29 Jan 186679.8DiedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Hogarth
Bishop William Hogarth (born , died ) Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDodding Green, Kendal, Westmorland, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained BishopSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Death PlaceParadise Row, Darlington, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 297, and Page 497
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 124
  • od/c0: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 46
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 31 Mar 2018