Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Riddell

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Lagania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1807Born
Aug 1829³22.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
Mar 1830³23.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 184336.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
22 Dec 184336.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lagania
17 Mar 184437.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lagania
11 Aug 184740.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
2 Nov 184740.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Riddell
Bishop William Riddell (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFelton Park, Northumberland

  • a priest for 17.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 235
  • c34: CB, 29 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,724
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 176
  • od: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017