Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelino Palentini, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jujuy, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1943Born
27 Jun 197026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
11 Jul 199551.8AppointedBishop of Jujuy, Argentina
7 Oct 199552.0Ordained BishopBishop of Jujuy, Argentina
18 Sep 201168.0DiedBishop of Jujuy, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Marcelino Palentini
Bishop Marcelino Palentini S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Jujuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaldogno, Italy

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 19 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,618
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast