Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Prieto Vega, I.E.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hwange


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1923BornBesande, Spain
10 Aug 194724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Instituto Español de San Francisco Javier para Misiones Extranjeras
1 Mar 196340.0AppointedBishop of Wankie, Zimbabwe
28 Apr 196340.1Ordained BishopBishop of Wankie, Zimbabwe
9 Feb 199975.9RetiredBishop of Hwange, Zimbabwe
9 May 200885.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Hwange, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Prieto Vega:
Bishop Ignacio Prieto Vega I.E.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hwange

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013