Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Floro Martínez, I.E.M.E.

Bishop Emeritus of Gokwe, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1940 Born
28 Jun 196525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Instituto Español de San Francisco Javier para Misiones Extranjeras
15 Oct 199959.6AppointedBishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe
19 Feb 200059.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe
28 Jan 201776.9RetiredBishop of Gokwe, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Angel Floro Martínez
Bishop Angel Floro Martínez I.E.M.E. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gokwe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAyna, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gokwe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,699
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 May 2017