Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Joseph Languet de Gergy

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1677Born
15 Jan 171537.3SelectedBishop of Soissons, France
29 May 171537.7ConfirmedBishop of Soissons, France
23 Jun 171537.8Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
20 Dec 173053.3SelectedArchbishop of Sens, France
9 Apr 173153.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens, France
11 May 175375.7DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Languet de Gergy
Archbishop Jean-Joseph Languet de Gergy (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon

  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast