Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Collins, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Antiphellus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1856Born
29 Aug 189134.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 189538.2ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Mar 190649.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles
12 Jun 190750.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles
12 Jun 190750.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
28 Oct 190750.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
15 Jun 191861.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles
30 Nov 193478.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Collins
Bishop John Joseph Collins S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Giamaica o Jamaica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaysville, KY, USA

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 59
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast