Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Joseph Garrigan

Deceased

Bishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1840Born
11 Jun 187029.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 190261.5AppointedBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
25 May 190261.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
14 Oct 191979.0DiedBishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Philip Joseph Garrigan
Bishop Philip Joseph Garrigan (born , died ) Bishop of Sioux City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWhitegate, Ireland

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 521
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast