Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Theodore Mulloy

Deceased

Bishop of Covington, Kentucky


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1892BornArdoch
7 Jun 191623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
11 Nov 194452.0AppointedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
10 Jan 194552.2Ordained BishopBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA
1 Jun 195966.6DiedBishop of Covington, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for William Theodore Mulloy:
Bishop William Theodore Mulloy (born , died ) Bishop of Covington

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013