Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Bosco Barbosa de Sousa, O.F.M.

Bishop of Osasco, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1952 BornGuaratinguetá
7 Jan 197825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jan 200754.1AppointedBishop of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil
25 Mar 200754.3Ordained BishopBishop of União da Vitória, Parana, Brazil
16 Apr 201461.4AppointedBishop of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Jul 201461.6InstalledBishop of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Bosco Barbosa de Sousa:
Bishop João Bosco Barbosa de Sousa O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Osasco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Osasco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,357
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2014
  • i: CB, 26 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014