Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Joseph-Arthur Melanson

Deceased

Archbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1879Born
9 Jul 190526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada
25 Nov 193253.6AppointedBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
22 Feb 193353.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
16 Dec 193657.7AppointedArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
23 Oct 194162.5DiedArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Louis-Joseph-Arthur Melanson
Archbishop Louis-Joseph-Arthur Melanson (born , died ) Archbishop of Moncton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrois-Rivières

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast