Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ange-François de Talaru de Chalmazel

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1725Born
21 Oct 176439.4SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
4 Feb 176539.7ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
10 Mar 176539.8Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
20 Mar 179872.8DiedBishop of Coutances, France

MicroData Summary for Ange-François de Talaru de Chalmazel
Bishop Ange-François de Talaru de Chalmazel (born , died ) Bishop of Coutances

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChaussins d’Abrest

  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast