Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus Legge

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1882Born
22 Mar 190724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
9 Sep 193249.8AppointedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
28 Oct 193250.0Ordained BishopBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
9 Mar 195168.3DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Petrus Legge
Bishop Petrus Legge (born , died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrakel

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast