Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustinus Philipp Baumann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Casius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1881BornNiedermarsberg
6 Apr 190624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
28 Oct 193250.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
28 Oct 193250.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Casius
21 Dec 193251.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casius
20 Feb 195371.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Augustinus Philipp Baumann:
Bishop Augustinus Philipp Baumann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013