Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Clóvis Frainer, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1931Born
27 Mar 195524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Jan 197846.7AppointedPrelate of Coxim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
9 Apr 197847.0Ordained BishopPrelate of Coxim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
5 Jan 198553.7AppointedArchbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
22 May 199160.1AppointedArchbishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Nov 200170.6ResignedArchbishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 Apr 201786.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Clóvis Frainer
Archbishop Clóvis Frainer O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Juiz de Fora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeranopolis
Death PlaceHospital da Unimed, Caxais do Sul, Diocese of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017