Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Ferrara, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Mupoi

Titular Bishop of Absa Salla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1905BornZeme Lomellina
14 Jul 192924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
11 Mar 194943.7AppointedPrefect of Mupoi, Sudan
15 Mar 196660.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Absa Salla
29 May 196660.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Absa Salla
18 Apr 197367.8ResignedPrefect of Mupoi, Sudan
21 Sep 199893.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Mupoi, Sudan

MicroData Summary for Domenico Ferrara:
Bishop Domenico Ferrara F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Mupoi

  • a priest for 69.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013