Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Secondo Chiocca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1905BornSan Quirico
2 Jun 192823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
18 Jan 194741.8AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
16 Mar 194741.9Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
15 Apr 195550.0ResignedBishop of Foligno, Italy
15 Apr 195550.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy
15 Apr 195550.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Bithynia
9 May 198176.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy
5 Jan 198276.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Secondo Chiocca:
Bishop Secondo Chiocca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1947, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013