Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sofronio Aguirre Bancud, S.S.S.

Bishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines

Apostolic Administrator of Bayombong


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1948 Born
2 May 197728.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
24 May 200152.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines
24 May 200152.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
2 Aug 200152.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida
6 Nov 200455.9AppointedBishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines
25 Jan 200556.1InstalledBishop of Cabanatuan, Philippines
28 May 201667.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bayombong, Philippines
25 Jul 201869.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Bayombong, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Sofronio Aguirre Bancud
Bishop Sofronio Aguirre Bancud S.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Cabanatuan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtulayan
Ordained BishopSanta Cruz, Church, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cabanatuan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,008
  • ab: CB, 6 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 Jun 2018

Quantcast