Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Boucar Tine, S.S.S.

Bishop of Kaolack, Senegal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1966 Born
6 Oct 199529.0Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
6 Jul 199629.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
25 Jul 201851.8AppointedBishop of Kaolack, Senegal
24 Nov 201852.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kaolack, Senegal
25 Nov 201852.1InstalledBishop of Kaolack, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Martin Boucar Tine
Bishop Martin Boucar Tine S.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Kaolack

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoudiadiène, Diocese of Thiès
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Collège Pie XII, Kaolack, Diocese of Kaolack

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kaolack.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Sep 2018
  • c34: CB, 8 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 27 Nov 2018

Quantcast