Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Joseph Harrington

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1918Born
19 Jan 194627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
2 Apr 196849.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
2 Apr 196849.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusuca
2 Jul 196849.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusuca
1 Sep 198364.7AppointedBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
13 Oct 198364.8InstalledBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
27 Oct 199475.8RetiredBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
23 Mar 199778.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Timothy Joseph Harrington
Bishop Timothy Joseph Harrington (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Worcester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHolyoke
Ordained PriestSpringfield, MA, Diocese of Springfield in Massachusetts

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 17 Jul 2018

Quantcast