Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Remigio Cardinal Crescini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Parma

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1757BornPiacenza
13 Nov 177417.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Jun 182871.1AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
6 Jul 182871.1Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
27 Jul 182972.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jul 183073.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
20 Jul 183073.2DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Remigio Crescini (VIAF: 89062705)
Remigio Cardinal Crescini O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Parma

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
  • a cardinal for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 25
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Jul 1829

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Jul 2016