Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Placid Morris, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Troas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1794BornLondon, Great Britain
4 Mar 181823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Aug 183136.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
9 Aug 183136.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
5 Feb 183237.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
Jan 184045.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
18 Feb 187277.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for William Placid Morris:
Bishop William Placid Morris O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 379

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013