Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Glandas Marie Erick Toussaint

Bishop of Jacmel, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1965 Born
13 Nov 199429.4Ordained PriestPriest of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
12 Jan 201145.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
12 Jan 201145.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Senez
26 Mar 201145.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Senez
8 Dec 201853.5AppointedBishop of Jacmel, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Glandas Marie Erick Toussaint
Bishop Glandas Marie Erick Toussaint (born ) Bishop of Jacmel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrande Savane, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince
Ordained BishopNear the ruins of, Cathedral, Port-au-Prince, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jacmel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,977
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Dec 2018

Quantcast