Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Launay Saturné

Archbishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1964 Born
10 Mar 199127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
28 Apr 201046.2AppointedBishop of Jacmel, Haïti
29 May 201046.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jacmel, Haïti
16 Jul 201854.5AppointedArchbishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
23 Sep 201854.6InstalledArchbishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Launay Saturné
Archbishop Launay Saturné (born ) Archbishop of Cap-Haïtien

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDelatte (Petit-Goâve), Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince
Ordained BishopÉcole Frère Clément, Jacmel, Diocese of Jacmel

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cap-Haïtien.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,650
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2018
  • i: CB, 25 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast