Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Javier Vilanova Pellisa

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Barcelona, Spain

Titular Bishop of Empúries


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1973 Born
22 Nov 199825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tortosa, Spain
6 Oct 202047.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
6 Oct 202047.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Empúries
20 Dec 202047.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Empúries

MicroData Summary for Javier Vilanova Pellisa
Father Javier Vilanova Pellisa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Fatarella, Diocese of Tortosa
Ordained BishopSagrada Familia, Basilica, Barcelona, Archdiocese of Barcelona

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Barcelona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 Oct 2020
  • ob: CB, 13 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast