Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sotero Phamo (Thein Myint)

Bishop Emeritus of Loikaw, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1943 Born
18 Mar 197228.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 198844.9AppointedBishop of Loikaw, Myanmar
22 Apr 198945.4Ordained BishopBishop of Loikaw, Myanmar
30 Sep 200258.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yangon, Myanmar
24 May 200359.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Yangon, Myanmar
26 Apr 201470.4ResignedBishop of Loikaw, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Sotero Phamo (Thein Myint)
Bishop Sotero Phamo (Thein Myint) (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Loikaw

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHoya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Loikaw.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,455
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast