Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Luis Arroyo Robelly, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1929Born
28 Oct 195829.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jan 198151.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Méndez, Ecuador
24 Jan 198151.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
26 Apr 198151.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
1 Jul 199363.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Méndez, Ecuador
13 Oct 200071.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Luis Arroyo Robelly
Bishop Teodoro Luis Arroyo Robelly S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiobamba

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast