Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Gabrielli, S.D.B.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Taparura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1931 Born
29 Jun 196231.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1 Jul 199362.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Méndez, Ecuador
1 Jul 199362.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Taparura
19 Sep 199362.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taparura
15 Apr 200877.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Méndez, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Pietro Gabrielli
Bishop Pietro Gabrielli S.D.B. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez

EventPlace
Birth PlacePove del Grappa, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Méndez.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,239
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast