Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reynaldo Gonda Evangelista

Bishop of Imus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1960 BornMabini
19 Jun 198626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lipa, Philippines
11 Dec 200444.6AppointedBishop of Boac, Philippines
26 Jan 200544.7Ordained BishopBishop of Boac, Philippines
22 Feb 200544.8InstalledBishop of Boac, Philippines
8 Apr 201352.9AppointedBishop of Imus, Philippines
5 Jun 201353.1InstalledBishop of Imus, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Reynaldo Gonda Evangelista:
Bishop Reynaldo Gonda Evangelista (born ) Bishop of Imus

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Imus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,812
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014