Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herberto Celso Angelo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mercedes-Luján

Titular Bishop of Coeliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1924BornChacabuco
12 Dec 194824.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 199066.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
31 Oct 199066.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Coeliana
19 Mar 199166.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coeliana
18 Jan 199368.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Herberto Celso Angelo:
Bishop Herberto Celso Angelo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mercedes-Luján

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,442
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013