Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Achille Palmerini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Isernia e Venafro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1906BornGallo di Tagliacozzo
12 May 192922.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 196256.0AppointedBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
24 Aug 196256.1Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
18 Mar 197265.7AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
18 Mar 197568.7ResignedBishop of Trivento, Italy
7 Apr 198376.8RetiredBishop of Isernia e Venafro, Italy
22 Mar 200093.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Isernia e Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Achille Palmerini:
Bishop Achille Palmerini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Isernia e Venafro

  • a priest for 70.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 126
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2000, Page 328
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015