Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Cannonero

Deceased

Bishop of Asti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1902Born
13 Jul 192422.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 195048.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Asti, Italy
16 Mar 195048.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
29 Jun 195048.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
11 Nov 195250.7AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
1 Aug 197775.5DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Cannonero
Bishop Giacomo Cannonero (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOvada

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • op/ab: CB, 15 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast