Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Egisto Domenico Melchiori

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1879Born
25 Aug 190122.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 192445.1AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
15 Jun 192445.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nola, Italy
5 Dec 193455.8AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
26 Dec 193455.8InstalledBishop of Tortona, Italy
26 Feb 194970.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tortona, Italy
2 Mar 196384.0DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Egisto Domenico Melchiori
Archbishop Egisto Domenico Melchiori (born , died ) Bishop of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBedizzole

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast