Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Alvarez Lara

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mallorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1902BornCastillo de Locubin
23 Jul 192724.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 194340.7AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
24 Oct 194341.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
10 Mar 196562.4AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
13 Apr 197370.5ResignedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
15 Dec 199694.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Alvarez Lara:
Bishop Rafael Alvarez Lara (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mallorca

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 53.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013