Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gea Escolano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1929Born
29 Jun 195324.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 197141.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
25 Mar 197141.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arae in Numidia
8 May 197141.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arae in Numidia
10 Sep 197647.2AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
15 May 198757.9AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
6 Jun 200575.9RetiredBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
6 Feb 201787.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Gea Escolano (VIAF: 1419657)
Bishop José Gea Escolano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mondoñedo-Ferrol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReal de Gandia
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 6 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017