Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Pla Gandía

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sigüenza-Guadalajara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1915BornAgullent
5 Jul 194226.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 197155.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
25 Mar 197155.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bareta
8 May 197155.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bareta
16 Apr 198165.3AppointedBishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara, Spain
11 Sep 199175.7RetiredBishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara, Spain
8 Nov 200084.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Sigüenza-Guadalajara, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jesús Pla Gandía:
Bishop Jesús Pla Gandía (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sigüenza-Guadalajara

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013