Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Manuel González y García

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1877BornSevilla
21 Sep 190124.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 191538.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Málaga, Spain
6 Dec 191538.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
16 Jan 191638.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olympus (Olimpus)
22 Apr 192043.1AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
5 Aug 193558.4AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
4 Jan 194062.8DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain
29 Apr 2001Beatified
16 Oct 2016Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Manuel González y García (VIAF: 90630370)
Bishop St. Manuel González y García (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 5
  • cano: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016