Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donatus Aihmiosion Ogun, O.S.A.

Bishop of Uromi, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1966 Born
28 Aug 198922.8ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
28 Aug 199225.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
31 Jul 199326.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
6 Nov 201448.0AppointedBishop of Uromi, Nigeria
31 Jan 201548.3Ordained BishopBishop of Uromi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Donatus Aihmiosion Ogun
Bishop Donatus Aihmiosion Ogun O.S.A. (born ) Bishop of Uromi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSapele

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uromi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2014
  • ob: CB, 17 Nov 2014
  • c2+: CB, 1 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast