Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Cueto y Díez de la Maza, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1839BornRiocorvo de Cohicillos
1863¹23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Jun 189151.6AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
27 Sep 189151.9Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
17 Aug 190868.8DiedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Cueto y Díez de la Maza:
Bishop José Cueto y Díez de la Maza O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013