Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benito Cardinal Sanz y Forés

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1828Born
27 Mar 185224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
30 May 186840.1SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
22 Jun 186840.2ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
8 Nov 186840.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
18 Nov 188153.6AppointedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
31 Mar 188254.0InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
30 Dec 188961.7AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
16 Jan 189364.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 189365.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
1 Nov 189567.6DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Benito Sanz y Forés (VIAF: 1862355)
Benito Cardinal Sanz y Forés (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGandía, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained PriestValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopVisitation (Salesian), Monastery, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
  • a cardinal for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 309, and Page 431
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 580, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 39, Number 2
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017