Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Cidad y Olmos

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1843Born
3 Jun 187127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valladolid, Spain
19 Apr 189753.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valladolid, Spain
19 Apr 189753.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Archelaïs
15 Aug 189753.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Archelaïs
25 Jun 190359.5AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
5 Jul 190359.5DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Cidad y Olmos
Bishop Mariano Cidad y Olmos (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid
Ordained BishopValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid
Death PlaceValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 117, and Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast